AMPTHILL CULTURAL EVENTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music and the arts in all their aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public events and by such other ways as the CIO through its trustees shall determine from time to time.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 31 October 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Nicholas Bottone | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Bourne | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Frederick William Digweed | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE LOUISE Milward | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARIELLA DIANE Cook | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CIO THROUGH ITS TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Folders Gate
Ampthill
MK45 2UN
- Phone:
- 07125043544
- Website:
-
Ampthillculturalevents.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.