1ST RHIWBINA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SCOUTING ACTIVITIES AND TRAINING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,034
Total expenditure: £16,099

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST RHIWBINA BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD JOHN WHISTON Chair
None on record
Dr Christopher Hugh George Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Dr ANDREW RODNEY Glanfield Trustee 06 July 2015
None on record
AMANDA VICTORIA HICKS Trustee 05 November 2013
None on record
MAUREEN JOAN LEWIS Trustee
None on record
KEITH LESLIE BODMAN Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL ERIC ROBERT LEWIS Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN THOMAS HOWARTH Trustee
None on record
ANGELA ABBOTT Trustee
None on record
GERARD NICHOLAS FOLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.60k £16.74k £14.88k £15.63k £21.03k
Total expenditure £14.11k £8.93k £6.04k £17.65k £16.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.00k £6.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 HEOL Y WAUN
CARDIFF
CF14 1LB
Phone:
02920611785
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available