NEWPORT (GWENT) DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 524986
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training Children/Young People In the City of Newport. South Wales

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £89,074
Total expenditure: £90,289

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Newport City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Ann Lewis Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Keith David Fernandez Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Margaret Elizabeth Thompson Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
SUSAN O'BRIAN Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record
Stephen Francis Crowley Trustee 13 May 2015
None on record
Robert Edward Lynch Trustee 13 May 2015
None on record
AMANDA SUSAN ELIZABETH SAY Trustee 13 May 2015
UNITED COUNTIES RDA TRAINING GROUP
Received: On time
CEFFYL DU RDA DRIVING GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Received: 6 days late
Andrew John Scarisbrick Trustee 13 May 2015
GWENT AREA SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
BLEADON CORONATION HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £63.74k £62.08k £58.27k £64.88k £89.07k
Total expenditure £62.62k £64.14k £44.92k £62.20k £90.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £22.70k £2.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
100 Ashford Close North
Croesyceiliog
CWMBRAN
NP44 2BL
Phone:
01633484776