Trustees CAMPBELL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1211522
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew James Stinson Chair 30 July 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Jennifer Lilian Gilbertson Trustee 24 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Clive Roy Poyser Trustee 25 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Victoria Williams Trustee 25 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
John Edward Somerville Trustee 25 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Caroline Davies Trustee 18 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Dr Jeffrey Anthony Polton Trustee 30 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Paul Williams Trustee 01 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time
Jane Helen ATFIELD Trustee
None on record
Timothy Godfrey Woodhead Trustee
None on record
Dr KEITH EDWARD GREGORY Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER ST PAULS WITH ST LUKES
Received: On time