THE CITY OF LONDON OCTOBER CLUB

Charity number: 1212366
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The City of London October Club raises funds through an annual dinner in Oct, selecting one charity partner each year. We provide substantial seed funding for transformative projects with potential for scale and sustainability. Our committee of volunteers from the financial services sector identifies worthy causes and engages City businesses to support initiatives that create lasting social impact

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 2025: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE OCTOBER CLUB (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Oldham Huggins Chair 20 October 2021
None on record
Victoria Christine Sanders Trustee 25 March 2025
FRIENDS OF THE HARVARD CLUB OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
Adela Elizabeth Barbara Eileen Pinkster Trustee 26 October 2017
None on record
Neil Anthony Pegrum Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Nicholas Anthony Crean Trustee 26 October 2016
FRIENDS OF ERLESTOKE PRISON
Received: On time
Nigel Stanley Gliksten Trustee 26 October 2016
None on record
Michele Hunter Trustee 26 October 2016
None on record
William Robert Tovey Trustee 26 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
63 FITZGEORGE AVENUE
LONDON
W14 0SZ
Phone:
07768464592