Trustees HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1211774
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Celine Kicks Chair 20 January 2025
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Karen Clarke Trustee 20 January 2025
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Amanda Foster Trustee 07 November 2024
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Jane Gerdes Trustee 09 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Jennifer Kennedy Trustee 07 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
David Incoll Trustee 01 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time