TOUCH OF SPARKLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touch of Sparkle primarily provides care packs to adult cancer patients at all stages of treatment - surgery, chemotherapy and radiotherapy. The care packs contain a range of practical items, distractions, snacks and treats. Touch of Sparkle also makes regular donations of reward toys to children undergoing a test or procedure in hospital.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 12 November 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elisabeth Anne Silver | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Melanie Suzanne Hersey M.A, B.A. | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Steed B.A. hons | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Swire M.A. | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF ADULT CANCER PATIENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH A CANCER CARE PACK PROVIDING A RANGE OF PRACTICAL ITEMS, DISTRACTIONS AND TREATS WHICH CAN BE BENEFICIAL IN EASING SOME OF THE SIDE EFFECTS OF CANCER TREATMENT AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH OTHER MEDICAL CONDITIONS BY PROVIDING GIFTS OF TOYS NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 FALMOUTH AVENUE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0UF
- Phone:
- 07951694651
- Email:
- touchofsparkle@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.