Dementia Support
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 December 2024: Standard registration
- SAGE HOUSE TANGMERE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Wickins | Chair | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Francis Kennedy | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Nesbit | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Broadribb | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 DEC 2024 as amended on 19 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE; 4.1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA AND OTHER RELATED DISORDERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE; AND 4.2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT DEMENTIA AND THE INDIRECT EFFECTS ON, AND THE NEEDS OF, PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR RELATIVES, FRIENDS AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEMENTIA SUPPORT
SAGE HOUSE
110-130 CITY FIELDS BUSINESS PARK
CITY FIELDS WAY
TANGMERE
PO20 2FP
- Phone:
- 01243888691
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.