Trustees SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1210750
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rex Philip Sartain Chair 31 October 2024
COUND GUILDHALL
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
RADBROOK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PRESTFELDE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: 75 days late
Guy Philip Chambers Trustee 14 November 2024
THE OLD ELLESMERIAN CLUB CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF THE KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY
Received: On time
Charles Warwick Symons Miller Trustee 14 November 2024
SHROPSHIRE ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST
Recently registered
William Prideaux Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Ann Kerr Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Adams-Taylor Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Samantha Brettell DL Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
John Gaspard Villar Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Major Charles Whitaker Trustee 14 May 2019
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Francis Stackhouse Acton Trustee 25 August 2014
ACTON SCOTT HERITAGE FARM
Recently registered
Marius Dale Coulon Trustee 08 October 2012
SHROPSHIRE ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST
Recently registered
TIMOTHY MICHAEL EVANS TD DL Trustee 22 May 2012
THE HARLEY CHARITY
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION
Received: 10 days late
THE BERWICK ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time