APEX FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1210644
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Apex Foundation is a not-for-profit entity set up by Apex Group to support charitable initiatives and projects that promote and make a difference to two key areas: (1) the preservation, conservation and protection of the environment; and (2) women's empowerment and economic independence.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosanna Frances Elizabeth Guest Chair 28 August 2023
None on record
Thomas Henry Wiggin Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Eoin Motherway Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Marcia Joanne Coatham Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
Tasneem Jeevanjee Trustee 28 August 2023
None on record
William James Chignell Trustee 28 August 2023
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
4th Floor
140 Aldersgate Street
London
United Kingdom
EC1A 4HY
Phone:
+442039611430
Website:

No information available