Financial history BETTWS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 525083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/08/2019 29/08/2020 29/08/2021 29/08/2022 29/08/2023
Total gross income £22.10k £26.88k £7.51k £11.32k £43.38k
Total expenditure £22.16k £21.07k £8.99k £12.20k £23.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A