1ST WEST PONTNEWYDD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,108
Total expenditure: £1,326

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Torfaen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Iwona Anna Cichon Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Jennifer Anne Marsh Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Trudi Gough Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Sian Louise Buxton Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Stephen Brian Vincent Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Tobius Tomas Gough Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Michelle Kirsty Martin Trustee 06 June 2022
None on record
Mary Barnett Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.66k £21.44k £1.25k £986 £2.11k
Total expenditure £2.62k £2.94k £5.17k £2.02k £1.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 July 2024 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Glenside, Pontnewydd
Pontnewydd
CWMBRAN
Cwmbran
NP44 1BN
Phone:
01633 874339
Website:

No information available