Norfolk and Norwich Animal Support
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal support for the promotion of humane behaviour for the benefit of animals, with particular focus on those that cannot be accommodated by other organisations by reason of age, long-term illness, behavioural difficulties or otherwise, by providing appropriate care, accommodation, protection, treatment and security of animals which are in need of care and attention.
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 21 November 2024: CIO registration
- Prickles, Claws & Paws (Working name)
- HALLSWOOD ANIMAL SANCTUARY CIO (Previous name)
- NORFOLK & NORWICH ANIMAL SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- NORFOLK & NORWICH ANIMAL SANCTUARY. (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Louis Ringer | Chair | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bhaskar Nair Gopakumar | Trustee | 07 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Featherby | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Karen Sian Davies | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver William Downes | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Louise Bowen-Jones | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Yvonne Grapes | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Lee Causer | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Anthony Bowen-Jones | Trustee | 11 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2024 as amended on 11 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO APPLY ITS INCOME AND CAPITAL TOWARDS THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE BEHAVIOUR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANIMALS, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THOSE THAT CANNOT BE ACCOMMODATED BY OTHER CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS BY REASON OF AGE, LONG-TERM ILLNESS, BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES OR OTHERWISE, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, ACCOMMODATION, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY OF ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING CHILDREN AND STUDENTS FROM EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS) IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abacus Accountancy
The Willows
Ipswich Road
Long Stratton
Norfolk
NR15 2TG
- Phone:
- 07734179299
- Email:
- neil@sportlink.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.