THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WINIFRED'S, MANATON

Charity number: 1211296
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST WINIFRED'S PCC MANATON (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RIGHT REVEREND NICHOLAS HOWARD PAUL MCKINNEL Chair 01 January 2024
BLUNDELL'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
Timothy George Baily Trustee 01 May 2018
CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
MANATON CHURCH FIELD
Received: On time
Anne Frances Payne Trustee 01 May 2016
CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
YVONNE ANNETTE CROUT Trustee 01 May 2008
PARISH HALL
Received: On time
Christopher Noel Butcher Trustee 01 May 2004
CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
Rose Anne Underhill Trustee 01 May 2002
CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
JOHN DREW PIKE Trustee 01 May 1999
NEWTON ABBOT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CLAUDE AND MARGARET PIKE WOODLANDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE STOVER CANAL TRUST
Received: On time
Colin Stewart Trustee 01 May 1995
MANATON CHURCH FIELD
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
James Hippisley Kidner Trustee
None on record
Sarah Catherine Elaine Baily Trustee
None on record
Rev Susan Sheppard Trustee
None on record
Ann Mosley Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
DEAL FARM
MANATON
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 9UQ
Phone:
01647221635
Website:

No information available