2ND ALLERTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 19 March 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Whitfield | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Burns-Lunt | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brittany Jessica Mason | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Wootten | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Richard Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Raynford Rawsthorne | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Hickson | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Marjorie Fanning | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Whelan | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Franklin | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Alexander Hickson | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sweeney | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Vincent Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Garnett | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAFFERTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD POPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.20k | £22.45k | £22.13k | £26.00k | £36.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.35k | £17.92k | £31.76k | £23.62k | £47.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.10k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
ALLERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clearview
Kylemore Avenue
LIVERPOOL
L18 4PY
- Phone:
- 07766080398
- Email:
- lunty28@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window