Trustees 2ND ALLERTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 525112
Up to date (34 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Whitfield | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Burns-Lunt | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brittany Jessica Mason | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Wootten | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Richard Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Raynford Rawsthorne | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Hickson | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Marjorie Fanning | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Whelan | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Franklin | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Alexander Hickson | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sweeney | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Vincent Pope | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Garnett | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAFFERTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD POPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.