IREBY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMER'S CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operate a Young Farmers Club for the advancement of social and educational welfare for young people in the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 July 1973: Standard registration
- 20 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134 | £129 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £910 | £65 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 28 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 28 April 2008 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 22 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 16 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE,HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. 2. IN THE INTEREST OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN DEVELOPMENT OF SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE (IREBY)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window