Financial history PENRITH PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY & TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 525136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £109.33k £123.82k £91.11k £86.08k £130.69k
Total expenditure £97.85k £119.78k £94.59k £96.92k £104.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £101.59k N/A £71.73k £109.34k