119TH DERBY (SINFIN MOOR) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A member of the Scout Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,443
Total expenditure: £10,355

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Baker Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Emily Broadhurst Trustee 27 May 2022
None on record
Vanessa Harris Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.34k £3.61k £6.12k £9.37k £9.44k
Total expenditure £5.23k £2.16k £4.86k £14.56k £10.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sinfin Moor Ecumenical Church
Arleston Lane
Stenson Fields
DERBY
DE24 3DH
Phone:
07502709789
Website:

No information available