1ST BURNMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a community based Scout Group. The Group is made up of 3 sections catering for boys and girls from the ages of 6 to 14 1/2. Each section has a varied programme of events throughout including camps, oudoor activites such as archery, wall climbing and orienteering. As well as outdoor pursuits the children take part in craft activities and are involved with the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 24 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robert Forster | Chair | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Jonathan Anderson | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Jane Forster | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Williams Colling | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BURNETT | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Winter | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Barclay | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Beck | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Bailey | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Matthews | Trustee | 01 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN FORSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.10k | £71.54k | £168.83k | £59.94k | £55.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.48k | £29.38k | £27.60k | £234.06k | £58.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.16k | £99.04k | £0 | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Robert Forster House
End of Gill Cresent North
Fence Houses
Houghton le Spring
County Durham
DH4 6AW
- Phone:
- 07725262746
- Email:
- treasure@1stburnmoor.co.uk
- Website:
-
1stburnmoor.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window