DAVENTRY METHODIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 13 March 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Brian Hutton | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna Ruth Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ernest Peter Muir | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
JUDITH ANNE BRIERLEY BA CERT ED | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN MANCHESTER | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Brenda Christine Collinson | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
AILEEN PATRICIA BREWER | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV DAVID PAUL COLLINSON | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Ian James Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Brierley | Trustee | 01 September 1992 |
|
|||||
MARGARET EVELYN GELDART | Trustee | 01 September 1992 |
|
|
||||
Tambainashe Mudavose | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Adrian Price | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Letwin Tandi Mudavose | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Angela Pauline Nelson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Pamela Jane Quarry | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Constance Irene Jeffery | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
June Rosamund Walker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Waldo Samuel Charles Ntow Opoku Gyekye | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Lesley Rigby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Samuel Baiden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Norma Steele | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kenny Hu | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Catherine Price | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Amene Opare | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 29 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAVENTRY METHODIST CHURCH
GOLDING CLOSE
DAVENTRY
NN11 4FB
- Phone:
- 01327702343
- Email:
- info@daventrymethodist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.