BRECON COUNTY UNIVERSITY SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 525312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Fund awards Scholarships or Grants to undergraduate students attending or about to attend University of Wales Cardiff (also known as Cardiff University) who are, or have a parent or parents, resident in the area covered by the Borough of Brecknock in the County of Powys.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,899
Total expenditure: £1,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrea Ballance Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
County Councillor William Powell Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
County Councillor Chris Walsh Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Mark Kerr Trustee 20 September 2013
None on record
DAVID JONES POWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £224 £1.83k £1.86k £1.90k £1.90k
Total expenditure £825 £1.75k £1.80k £825 £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Secretary to the Trustees
19 Holcombe Drive
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
Powys
LD1 6DN
Phone:
01597822849
Website:

No information available