Accounts and annual returns ALDERMAN BEN EVANS AGRICULTURAL SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 525383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 05 June 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required