Financial history ALDERMAN BEN EVANS AGRICULTURAL SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 525383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £416 £424 £436 £452 £466
Total expenditure £0 £0 £700 £300 £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A