Linked charities CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
Charity Number: 525493
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1921 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS DATED 9 MARCH 1928, 21 DECEMBER 1931, 30 SEPTEMBER 1936 AND SCHEME OF 4 MARCH 1969
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE STUDY OF TUBERCULAR DISEASES AND OTHER COGNATE SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 04 January 1973 : Standard registration
- 28 September 1994 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.