Financial history SULLY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 525549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.64k £11.03k £23.66k £17.57k £24.75k
Total expenditure £2.55k £2.65k £7.50k £36.25k £26.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A