THE ARTS THEATRE CAMBRIDGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 March 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM NIGEL HUGILL | Chair | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Victoria Stewart | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Lee Dean | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Professor Sir Menelas Pangalos FRS | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Nicole Marie Shepard | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR SIR LESZEK KRZYSZTOF BORYSIEWICZ | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Christopher Prideaux | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dr THOMAS KEITH CARNE | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW THOMAS SWARBRICK | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
JEFFREY MICHAEL ILIFFE | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE PAKENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Jayne Newman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I) THE PRODUCTION, PROMOTION, PRESENTATION AND MANAGEMENT OF DRAMA, DANCE AND MUSIC AND ANY OTHER FORMS OF ART ALLIED TO THE SAME; AND/OR (II) EXHIBITIONS, EVENTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CAMBRIDGE ARTS THEATRE
6 ST. EDWARDS PASSAGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 3PJ
- Phone:
- 01223578950
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.