THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S, SOUTHAMPTON, IN THE DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Marks is a Church of England parish church, operating in Banister Park, in the heart of Southampton. We gather weekly on a Sunday to worship Jesus, and conduct a variety of activities throughout the week to reach out to and provide services for our local community. We run baby and toddler groups, lunch club, and coffee & chat drop in events, plus youth & children's groups mid-week & Sundays.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southampton City
Governance
- 03 March 2025: Standard registration
- ST MARK'S CHURCH, ARCHERS RD, SOUTHAMPTON (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Marc James Allez | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Nicholas O'Neill | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Mary Willis | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Georgia Annette Condell PGCE | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SEED | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Herschel-Clark | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Barlow | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Derek Jeffrey Willis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Olufunke Falua | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Mark Coombs | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Leah Anne Pike | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Pike | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Williams | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jayne Diane Wood | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sophie Jane Baker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Reuben Tierney Humphreys | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1952
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARKS CHURCH
ARCHERS ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 2LU
- Phone:
- 02380632690
- Email:
- admin@stmarkschurch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.