Accounts and annual returns THE FOUNDATION OF GRIFFITH OWEN (THE CATECHISING BRANCH)

Charity number: 525585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required