Trustees THE MONMOUTHSHIRE FARM SCHOOL ENDOWMENT
Charity number: 525649

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Groucutt | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penri James | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Stevens | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Cross | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Andrews | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane McKenna | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wright | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clark | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Murphy | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.