ESSEX WATERWAYS NAVIGATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity, along with its trading subsidiary Essex Waterways Ltd, manages the Chelmer and Blackwater Navigation in Essex for public benefit.
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 12 March 2025: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Richard Pomfret | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Glen Leigh Fulton | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mark Hunter Edmond | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Eric Jenkins | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Edwards | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROY EDGAR CHANDLER | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: 2.1 THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT, OPERATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHELMER AND BLACKWATER NAVIGATION AND ANY EXTENSION TO THE EXISTING WATERWAYS (THE "NAVIGATION"): 2.1.1 FOR NAVIGATION; 2.1.2 FOR WALKING ON THE TOWPATHS; AND 2.1.3 FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME PURSUITS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. 2.2 PROTECTING AND CONSERVING SITES, OBJECTS AND BUILDINGS OF ARCHAEOLOGICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, ENGINEERING OR HISTORIC INTEREST ON, IN THE VICINITY OF, OR OTHERWISE ASSOCIATED WITH, THE NAVIGATION. 2.3 PROMOTING AWARENESS, LEARNING AND EDUCATION ABOUT THE NAVIGATION, ITS HISTORY, DEVELOPMENT, USE, OPERATION AND CULTURAL HERITAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Navigation Office
Paper Mill Lock
NORTH HILL
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4BS
- Phone:
- 01245226245
- Email:
- essex@waterways.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.