Financial history TASKER MILWARD AND PICTON CHARITY

Charity number: 525678
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.84k £59.87k £69.49k £62.71k £111.70k
Total expenditure £54.10k £2.73k £50.45k £232.77k £77.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A