Governing document CHARLES PRICE'S ENDOWMENT
Charity number: 525704

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15 OCTOBER 1894 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 22 AUGUST 1898, 24 SEPTEMBER 1901 AND 9 APRIL 1906. REPLACED BY SCHEME DATED 18 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF LLANSANFFRAID CWNDAUDDWR
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.