THE JOHN BEDDOES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 525713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making grants to individuals and organisations in East Radnorshire for educational purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,837
Total expenditure: £6,553

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POWYS RADNORSHIRE EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT (Previous name)
  • THE RADNORSHIRE INTERMEDIATE AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beverley Baynham Chair 15 April 2014
None on record
Paul Richard Marsh Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Louise Powell Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Sonja Parg Trustee 15 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.61k £7.50k £7.24k £6.51k £7.84k
Total expenditure £4.08k £5.39k £2.24k £4.42k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JOHN BEDDOES CAMPUS
BROADAXE LANE
PRESTEIGNE
POWYS
LD8 2YT
Phone:
01544267259