Financial history DEYTHEUR EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 525718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.67k £14.79k £20.03k £14.44k £15.90k
Total expenditure £13.50k £13.72k £15.69k £14.00k £15.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A