THE THOMAS HOWELL'S EDUCATION FUND FOR NORTH WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The award of grants to institutions and organisations in support of a broad range of educational initiatives for young people under the age of 25 in North Wales. It strives to increase student inclusiveness across primary, secondary, further and higher education, particularly in areas of high deprivation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE DRAPERS COMPANY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.06k | £343.96k | £344.45k | £346.23k | £351.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £286.85k | £297.82k | £303.91k | £397.27k | £342.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 1975 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 6 NOVEMBER 1986 AND 18 DECEMBER 1992. AS AMENDED ON THE 22 FEBRUARY 1996 BY A ,RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 11 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR UNDERGOING EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE DECIDES.
Area of benefit
NORTH WALES
Linked charities
- HOWELL'S SCHOOL CENTENARY AND MISS CICELY ROBINSON MEMORIAL FUND
- HOWELL'S SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
- HOWELL'S SCHOOL PRIZE FUND TRUST
- MISS W A WOODCOCK'S PRIZE FUND
- SPEECH AND DRAMA PRIZE FUND
- TESNI PARRY PRIZE FUND
- THE CHARLOTTE OWEN FUND
- THE MARY BREARLEY MUSIC FUND
- THE MISS J M TRAVESS PRIZE FUND
- THE REBECCA OWEN FUND
- THE SALTERS' COMPANY CHEMISTRY PRIZE FUND
- 16 July 1985 : Standard registration
- 19 March 2003 : Removed
- 19 March 2003 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DRAPERS COMPANY
DRAPERS HALL
THROGMORTON AVENUE
LONDON
EC2N 2DQ
- Phone:
- 02075885001
- Email:
- charities@thedrapers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window