Governing document THE THOMAS HOWELL'S EDUCATION FUND FOR NORTH WALES
Charity number: 525753

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 1975 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 6 NOVEMBER 1986 AND 18 DECEMBER 1992. AS AMENDED ON THE 22 FEBRUARY 1996 BY A ,RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 11 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR UNDERGOING EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE DECIDES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.