BUCHANAN FAMILY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Buchanan Family Foundation aims to provide support to children in economically or socially disadvantaged areas. Our main benefactors are primary schools in the South African Limpopo province, and we collect donations, educational resources and other forms of support which are beneficial to the children we support.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- New Zealand
- South Africa
Governance
- 13 March 2025: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maximillian Britz | Chair | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Britz | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Britz | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lady Rosemary Buchanan | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Britz | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT UNDERFUNDED SCHOOLS OR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED PUPILS INTERNATIONALLY (NON-UK), BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR FUNDING (NOT PROVIDED BY ANY LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION OR RECREATION AT SCHOOL. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIPPENHALL GRANGE
DIPPENHALL
FARNHAM
GU10 5ED
- Phone:
- 01252725020
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.