THE EVAN MORGAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 17 November 1965: Standard registration
- 28 August 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE EVAN MORGAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND (ICW THE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF WALES, ABERYSTWYTH) (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME DATED 27 MAY 1946, VARIED BY SCHEME 17 MARCH 1967 AND SCHEME 13 MAY 1988
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO YOUNG PERSONS OF EITHER SEX, WHO (OR WHOSE PARENTS OR ONE OR OTHER OF THEM) WERE BORN OR ARE NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE PRINCIPALITY OF WALES (INCLUDING MONMOUTHSHIRE) WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, AND WHO HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME BEEN IN ATTENDANCE AS PUPILS AT A SECONDARY SCHOOL IN THE PRINCIPALITY OF WALES, (INCLUDING MONMOUTHSHIRE).
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALITY OF WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.