Accounts and annual returns THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE ABERYSTWYTH

Charity Number: 525778
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 08 November 2006 8 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 20 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 20 October 2005 On Time