TRINITY COLLEGE CARMARTHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The original charitable endowment of Trinity College Carmarthen. The provision, maintenance and development of a College for the Higher and Further education of men and women, including in particular and without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing the training of teachers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1960: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trinity University College | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.01k | £50.01k | £50.09k | £51.33k | £51.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.20k | £303.47k | £354.07k | £359.04k | £359.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 12 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF A COLLEGE FOR THE HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION OF MEN AND WOMEN, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE COLLEGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of Wales Trinity St. David
College Road
CARMARTHEN
United Kingdom
SA31 3EP
- Phone:
- 01267 676767
- Email:
- planning@uwtsd.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window