CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support Church of England Schools in the Diocese of Chester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,574,434
Donations and legacies | £2.02m | |
Charitable activities | £100.95k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £455.01k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,862,711
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.86m | |
Other | £0 |
£913,194 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,924,280 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.86m | |
Retained for future use | £711.72k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.86m | |
Retained for future use | £1.62m |
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Halton
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Warrington
- Wirral
- Wrexham
Governance
- 09 March 1967: Standard registration
- CHESTER DIOCESAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Corley | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gibbons | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bridgman | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Arnott | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Speed | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hermitt | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Darren Paul Walter | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eileen Cruxton | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Gordon | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Sharon Hudson | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ven Dr Michael Gilbertson | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Cumberland | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BOWDEN LLB LLM | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Lyndon Russell Bannon | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £492.10k | £1.06m | £2.29m | £2.46m | £2.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £716.21k | £455.91k | £2.29m | £2.38m | £1.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.77m | £1.92m | £1.92m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £1.82m | £1.96m | £2.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £502.09k | £82.26k | £82.04k | £100.95k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £522.21k | £389.64k | £418.30k | £455.01k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £455.91k | £2.29m | £2.38m | £1.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.00k | £13.20k | £11.88k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £590 | £2.73k | £25.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.03m | £1.50m | £2.94k | £1.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £10.06m | £11.53m | £11.33m | £10.85m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £2.03m | £1.99m | £2.69m | £3.41m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £1.78m | £986.08k | £1.61m | £1.40m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1943 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/10/1995 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 9/5/2017 as amended on 01 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ACT AS THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE, AND TO EXERCISE AND PERFORM WITHIN THE DIOCESE THE RIGHTS POWERS DUTIES AND OBLIGATIONS BY THE MEASURE, AND ANY AMENDMENTS AND RE-ENACTMENTS, GIVEN TO AND IMPOSED ON IT BY THAT MEASURE.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE COUNTY AND DIOCESE OF CHESTER.
Linked charities
- 09 March 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chester Diocesan Board of Education
5500 Daresbury Park
Daresbury
WARRINGTON
WA4 4GE
- Phone:
- 01928718834
- Website:
-
chesterdbe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window