THE BARRACK HILL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the educational advance of younger generation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Stockport
Governance
- 08 November 1963: Standard registration
- BARRACK HILL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA SMART | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Angie Clark | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH COPE | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HOWE | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
STUART CORRIS | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £9.00k | £8.00k | £7.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | £7.00k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN PROVIDING FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE SAME SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVENORS OF THE SCHOOL CONCERNED; (B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGEOF 21 YEARS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE PARENT RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (FOR FUTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 27 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
BREDBURY AND ROMILEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HENBURY DRIVE
WOODLEY
STOCKPORT
SK6 1PY
- Phone:
- 0161 494 2521
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window