Accounts and annual returns MARY HARRISON

Charity number: 525839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 09 July 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 13 February 2023 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 05 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required