MARY HARRISON

Charity number: 525839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides funds to Clutton Church of England Primary School, part of The Samara Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023

Total income: £113
Total expenditure: £365

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CLUTTON SCHOOL CHA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Dorset MBE Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Linzi Georgeson Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth James Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £104 £105 £107 £111 £113
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £365
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 09 July 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 13 February 2023 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 05 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
475 Chester Road
Hartford
Northwich
Cheshire
CW8 2AG
Phone:
07908156060
Website:

No information available