FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity Number: 525844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VARIOUS SUPPORTS FOR FRODSHAM CE PRIMARY SCHOOL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,311
Total expenditure: £40,050

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRODSHAM CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (Working name)
  • FRODSHAM ENDOWED SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phyllis Betty Rutter Chair 12 September 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAURENCE, FRODSHAM
Received: On time
David Woodhouse Trustee 22 September 2024
None on record
Stephanie Lynne Parker Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
WILLIAM DAVID COOK Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Rev Elaine Atack Trustee 11 May 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAURENCE, FRODSHAM
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JAMES HARRISON
Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days
CHARITY OF MRS MARY CHESSHYRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days
TERENCE HAYES Trustee
None on record
MRS CHRIS WILDING Trustee
None on record
Dr ANDREW MILTON RUDD Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAURENCE, FRODSHAM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.25k £23.53k £26.13k £24.37k £25.31k
Total expenditure £18.60k £18.11k £21.36k £24.00k £40.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 February 2023 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 February 2023 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 November 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 20TH AUGUST 1940 (PRINTED REPORTS VOLUME 31 PAGE 423).
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 08 June 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Vicarage
Vicarage Lane
FRODSHAM
WA6 7DU
Phone:
01928733378
Website:

No information available