HIGH LEGH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 - In promoting the education, including social and physical training, of persons under the age of 25 years who are or who have a parent resident in the said parish in such ways as the Trustees think fit. 2 - In providing for any school in the Parish of High Legh or substantially serving the same such special benefits of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority as may from
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 05 August 1985: Standard registration
- JOSEPH HASELHURST (Previous name)
- SCHOOLHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD GREY OF CODNOR RICHARD CORNWALL LEGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD S C CORNWALL-LEGH | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREA HOSKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/02/2020 | 22/02/2021 | 22/02/2022 | 22/02/2023 | 22/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £2.07k | £2.59k | £2.33k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | £3.31k | £1.43k | £1.82k | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 AUGUST 1985.
Charitable objects
1. PROVIDING FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF HIGH LEGH OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE SAME SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2. IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE PARISH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HIGH LEGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Eagle Lodge
19 Harrop Road,Hale
ALTRINCHAM
Cheshire
WA15 9DA
- Phone:
- 01925754285
- Email:
- mike_cyn@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window