Governing document THE GRANGE SCHOOL HARTFORD LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH JULY 1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1993, 4 MARCH 2003, 29 MARCH 2007 AND 27 APRIL 2009 as amended on 25 May 2021
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY B) TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY OTHER SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.