Trustees THE GRANGE SCHOOL HARTFORD LIMITED
Charity number: 525918

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Begg | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Athalia Dangerfield | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roland Partridge | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Webster | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Matthews | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Nigel Tabb | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Eglin | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Pollard | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Sherry Mr | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Brocklebank Mr | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Llewellyn Mr | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Naomi Anne Jayatilake | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.