Governing document KING'S SCHOOL, MACCLESFIELD
Charity number: 525921
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1879 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 05 JULY 1898, 04 NOVEMBER 1901, 18 OCTOBER 1909, 19 MARCH 1958, 30 MARCH 1967, THE KINGS SCHOOL IN MACCLESFIELD FOUNDATION (MODIFICATION) ORDER DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1986 AND A SCHEME DATED 24 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC SECONDARY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS AND BOYS AS DAY SCHOLARS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.